Case: 01-94-00280-CR
01-94-00280-CR
03/18/1994
Felony DWI
Barrett, William Harold
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/31/1995 | Mandate issued | | |
03/11/1995 | No petition for review or writ of error was filed | | |
02/24/1995 | Motion for Rehearing Due | | |
02/24/1995 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |
02/09/1995 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
02/09/1995 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
01/31/1995 | Submitted | | |
01/31/1995 | Submission | | |
01/31/1995 | Submitted | | |
11/23/1994 | Submission | | |
11/10/1994 | Brief Due | | |
11/10/1994 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
11/09/1994 | Brief filed-oral argument has been waived | | |
11/09/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
11/09/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/28/1994 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
07/20/1994 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
07/07/1994 | Statement of facts filed | | |
06/23/1994 | Motion to extend time to file state of facts disp | Grant motion | |
06/13/1994 | Motion to extend time to file statement of facts | | |
05/13/1994 | Transcript filed | | |
03/18/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
03/17/1994 | Date of Sentence in Criminal Case | | |
03/17/1994 | Notice of appeal filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/31/1995 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
TEXAS, THE STATE OF | Criminal - State of Texas | Linda West John B. Holmes |
BARRETT, WILLIAM HAROLD | Criminal - Appellant | Kirby Taylor |
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 12
Harris
9344349
180 days prob