Case: 11-94-00034-CR
11-94-00034-CR
03/21/1994
Assault & battery
McCullar, Everett Lee
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
02/09/1996 | Mandate issued | | |
01/12/1996 | Case returned from higher court | | |
12/31/1995 | Yearly opinion book | | |
12/14/1995 | Petition for Discretionary Review in Criminal case or Petition for Review in Civil Case disposed | Refused | |
10/13/1995 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |
10/12/1995 | Petition for Discretionary Review in Criminal case or Petition for Review in Civil Case | | |
09/14/1995 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
08/31/1995 | Submitted | | |
08/31/1995 | Submission set in Eastland | | |
08/28/1995 | Submission set in Eastland | | |
03/22/1995 | Supp. brief filed | | |
01/26/1995 | Mot. - To file disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/26/1995 | Supp. brief filed | | |
01/18/1995 | Mot. - For leave/permission to file late article | | |
01/12/1995 | Supplemental Brief received - not filed | | |
12/31/1994 | Yearly opinion book | | |
12/15/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
12/14/1994 | Brief filed | | |
11/23/1994 | Brief filed | | |
11/23/1994 | Mot. - To file disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/18/1994 | Mot. - For leave/permission to file late article | | |
11/18/1994 | Brief received | | |
11/03/1994 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/25/1994 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief | | |
09/29/1994 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/23/1994 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief | | |
08/25/1994 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposed | Writ or Motion Granted in Part | |
08/19/1994 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief | | |
07/28/1994 | We send letter to lawyers, etc. | | |
07/21/1994 | Motion to withdraw disposed | Overruled | |
07/18/1994 | SF filed | | |
07/18/1994 | Case reinstated | | |
07/18/1994 | Supp. TR filed | | |
07/18/1994 | Case reinstated | | |
06/30/1994 | Order entered | Abated | |
06/24/1994 | Motion to withdraw filed | | |
06/17/1994 | Inquiring on status, etc. of case | | |
05/19/1994 | Mot. - Ext. time to file SF disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/13/1994 | Mot. - Ext. time to file SF | | |
05/09/1994 | TR filed | | |
03/21/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
03/07/1994 | Judgment of trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/09/1996 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mccullar, Everett Lee | Criminal - Appellant | Robert F. Watson |
State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Jerry D. Ray, Retired Judge |
Trial Court Information
29th District Court
Palo Pinto
Honorable David G. Cleveland, Judge
9753