Case: PD-0316-94
PD-0316-94
03/21/1994
PDR Case Type
SOTELO, EX PARTE JOE ANGELO, JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/02/1994 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
05/18/1994 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
05/18/1994 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
05/18/1994 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
05/18/1994 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
03/30/1994 | PDR FILED | | |
03/30/1994 | PDR FILED | | |
03/21/1994 | PDR FILED | | |
03/21/1994 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/14/1994 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
SOTELO, EX PARTE JOE ANGELOJ | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Ward Casey |
STATE OF TEXAS | State | Tim Curry |
Court of Appeals Information:
02-93-00167-CR
AFF 12-31-93
2nd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court 1
Tarrant
Honorable R. E. THORNTON
C-3402