Case: AP-71,817
AP-71,817
03/21/1994
Appeal Case Type
BROWN, ARTHUR, JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/25/1995 | BRIEF FILED | State | |
04/17/1995 | BRIEF FILED | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/10/2013 | EXECUTION DATE SET | | |
02/11/1998 | REQ PREPYMT MADE | | |
02/05/1998 | REQ PREPYMT DISP | Granted | |
02/04/1998 | REQ PREPYMT RECD | | |
01/30/1998 | MOTION DISP | Granted | |
01/30/1998 | MOTION FILED | | |
01/27/1998 | MOTION FILED | | |
01/15/1998 | MOTION DISP | Granted | |
01/05/1998 | MOTION FILED | | |
10/23/1997 | WRIT OF CERT USSC | DENIED | |
09/15/1997 | REQ PREPYMT MADE | | |
09/09/1997 | REQ PREPYMT DISP | Granted | |
09/08/1997 | REQ PREPYMT RECD | | |
07/01/1997 | APPT COUNSEL/ORDER | Granted | |
06/05/1997 | WRIT OF CERT USSC | Filed | |
03/14/1997 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate of a process | | |
03/14/1997 | MANDATE ISSD | | |
02/26/1997 | REHEAR DISP | DENIED | |
02/26/1997 | REHEAR DISP | DENIED | |
01/06/1997 | REHEAR FILED DP | | |
01/06/1997 | REHEAR FILED | | |
12/18/1996 | OPINION ISSD | Affirmed | |
12/18/1996 | OPINION ISSD | Affirmed | |
05/20/1996 | TC NOTICE RECEIVED | | |
11/29/1995 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process | | |
11/29/1995 | SUBMITTED | | |
11/27/1995 | NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT | | |
11/21/1995 | NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT | | |
10/25/1995 | BRIEF FILED | | |
10/25/1995 | MOTION DISP | Granted | |
10/25/1995 | MOTION FILED | | |
10/24/1995 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission of a process | | |
10/24/1995 | SET FOR SUBMIS | | |
10/16/1995 | EXT BRIEF DISP | DENIED | |
10/16/1995 | EXT BRIEF FILED | | |
05/16/1995 | EXT BRIEF DISP/NFE | Granted | |
05/15/1995 | EXT BRIEF FILED | | |
04/17/1995 | BRIEF FILED | | |
04/17/1995 | MOTION DISP | Granted | |
04/17/1995 | MOTION FILED | | |
03/20/1995 | EXT BRIEF DISP/NFE | Granted | |
03/20/1995 | EXT BRIEF FILED | | |
11/28/1994 | EXT BRIEF DISP | Granted | |
11/28/1994 | EXT BRIEF FILED | | |
10/11/1994 | EXT SF DISP | Granted | |
10/11/1994 | EXT SF FILED | | |
10/11/1994 | SF FILED DP | | |
09/22/1994 | EXT SF DISP/NFE | Granted | |
09/22/1994 | EXT SF FILED | | |
03/23/1994 | EXT SF DISP/NFE | Granted | |
03/23/1994 | EXT SF FILED | | |
03/21/1994 | DP BEGIN | | |
03/21/1994 | DP BEGIN | | |
03/21/1994 | TRANSCRIPT FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/14/1997 | STORED | CASE STORED |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
STATE OF TEXAS | State | John B. Holmes |
BROWN, ARTHURJR. | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
351st District Court
Harris
Honorable LUPE SALINAS
636535