judyrecords
search tips
700 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Brooks, Michael Joe v. The State of Texas

Case: 14-94-00271-CR
14-94-00271-CR
03/21/1994
Other Drug Possession
Brooks, Michael Joe
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/22/1998Misc motion DISPOSEDDENIED
01/12/1998Misc Motion filed
12/12/1997Mandate IssuedAFFIRMED
09/13/1996Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDGRANTED
06/17/1996Petition for discretionary review due
06/10/1996Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
06/05/1996Extend time to file PDR DISPOSEDGRANTED
05/28/1996Petition for discretionary review due
05/10/1996Motion for rehearing DUE
04/25/1996Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
04/25/1996Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
04/25/1996Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
10/31/1995Submitted
10/31/1995Submission
10/31/1995Submitted
09/29/1995Submission
08/03/1995Extend time to file PDR DISPOSEDDENIED
07/31/1995Extend time to file PDR FILED
07/05/1995State's brief DUE
06/30/1995Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
06/30/1995Case ready to be set
06/30/1995Case ready to be set
06/08/1995Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
06/08/1995State's brief DUE
05/31/1995Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
05/18/1995Mtn.supplement record DISPOSED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STAGRANTED
05/18/1995No description available.
05/11/1995Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
05/11/1995Mtn.to supplement record FILED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STA
05/11/1995Supplemental Statement of Facts RECEIVED-ANT,APE
05/05/1995Appellant's brief DUE
05/04/1995Mtn.withdraw as attorney DISPOSED-ANT,APE,DENIED
04/28/1995Mtn.withdraw as attorney FILED-ANT,APE
03/30/1995Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
03/21/1995Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/20/1995Appellant's brief DUE
02/09/1995Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
02/03/1995Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
02/03/1995Past due brief
02/02/1995Appellant's brief DUE
01/03/1995Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
12/30/1994Record due
12/08/1994Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
12/05/1994Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
10/13/1994Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
10/04/1994Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
07/21/1994Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
07/21/1994No description available.
07/18/1994Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
07/14/1994Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
07/14/1994Supplemental transcript RECEIVED - ANT,APE,STA
07/05/1994Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
06/24/1994Transcript received only; mtn. pending
06/23/1994Motion to substitute attorney DISPOSED-ANT,APEGRANTED
06/20/1994Motion to substitute attorney FILED-ANT,APE
05/10/1994Record due
03/21/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/16/1994Date of Sentence
03/11/1994Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
03/03/1994Motion for new trial FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/10/1996Appeal to Higher CourtHigher court review
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasDavid P. Bosserman
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantTerri Tipton Holder
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasJim Mapel
Trial Court Information
23rd District Court
Brazoria
26,309
15 yrs. TDC