Case: 94-0273
94-0273
03/21/1994
See former TRAP 130(D)
ANTOINETTE DEVINE
JOHN DEVINE
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/07/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
05/11/1994 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/07/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
07/26/1994 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | No Mo/Re filed | | |
06/22/1994 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | App denied | |
05/26/1994 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
05/25/1994 | MET to file reply disposed of | Form Letter sent in response to motion for extension of time | standard letter sent | |
05/11/1994 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | | |
03/25/1994 | APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ERROR IS DUE TO BE FILED | 05-02-94 | | |
03/25/1994 | Extension of time to file app writ err disposed of | Filing granted | App due on or before 05-02-94 | |
03/21/1994 | Extension of time to file app writ err filed | Envelope attached | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
07/26/1994 | Case Stored | Case stored. | No Mo/Re filed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
DEVINE, JOHN | Respondent | Mr. Thomas P. Goranson |
DEVINE, ANTOINETTE | Petitioner | Honorable Ann Crawford McClure |
Court of Appeals Information:
07-92-00111-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
869 SW2d 415, 10-01-93
7th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
254th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dee Miller
90-14404-R