Case: 08-94-00065-CR
08-94-00065-CR
03/18/1994
Other Felony
Escalante, Robert
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/29/1995 | Mandate Issued | | |
11/29/1995 | Shuck purged | | |
11/29/1995 | Mandate Issued | | |
09/14/1995 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | |
09/14/1995 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | |
09/08/1995 | Submitted | | |
09/08/1995 | Submission | | |
09/08/1995 | Submitted | | |
07/26/1995 | Submission | | |
05/03/1995 | Brief Filed | | |
05/03/1995 | Case ready to be set | | |
05/03/1995 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/03/1995 | Case ready to be set | | |
04/17/1995 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
03/29/1995 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/15/1995 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
01/25/1995 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/13/1995 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
12/19/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
11/02/1994 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/02/1994 | Order entered | | |
10/18/1994 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
08/24/1994 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/10/1994 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
06/29/1994 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/22/1994 | Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion | | |
06/14/1994 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
06/01/1994 | Motion for Extension Statement of Facts Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/01/1994 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
05/20/1994 | Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed | | |
04/20/1994 | Transcript Filed | | |
03/18/1994 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
03/18/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/29/1995 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
ESCALANTE, ROBERT | Criminal - Appellant | Hon. Thomas S. Hughes |
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Jaime E. Esparza |
Trial Court Information
120th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Robert Dinsmoor
69779-120
10 Yrs TDC