Case: 05-95-00671-CR
05-95-00671-CR
05/18/1995
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Perez, Efrain Sandoval
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/02/1998 | Mandate Issued | | |||
03/02/1998 | Mandate Issued | | |||
12/22/1997 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | | ||
12/22/1997 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | | ||
12/03/1997 | Submitted | | |||
12/03/1997 | Submission | | |||
12/03/1997 | Submitted | | |||
10/09/1997 | Submission | | |||
02/14/1997 | MattConv | | |||
02/12/1997 | Brief Filed |
| |||
02/12/1997 | Case ready to be set | | |||
02/12/1997 | Case ready to be set | | |||
02/07/1997 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
01/31/1997 | MattConv | | |||
01/31/1997 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
12/27/1996 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
12/16/1996 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
11/18/1996 | MattConv | | |||
08/26/1996 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
08/22/1996 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
08/18/1996 | MattConv | | |||
07/24/1996 | Brief Filed |
| |||
12/18/1995 | MattConv | | |||
12/05/1995 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
11/21/1995 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
11/10/1995 | MattConv | | |||
10/18/1995 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
10/10/1995 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
09/25/1995 | Motion to Substitute Attorney Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
09/24/1995 | MattConv | | |||
09/13/1995 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
09/10/1995 | MattConv | | |||
09/07/1995 | Motion to Substitute Attorney | | |||
09/06/1995 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
08/11/1995 | MattConv | | |||
08/11/1995 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |||
06/13/1995 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
06/13/1995 | Mot for Ext Transcript Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
06/06/1995 | Transcript Filed | | |||
06/06/1995 | Transcript Tendered | | |||
06/02/1995 | Mot - Ext. to File Transcript | | |||
06/02/1995 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |||
05/28/1995 | Record due | | |||
05/19/1995 | Notice Sent | | |||
05/18/1995 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |||
03/29/1995 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | | |||
03/29/1995 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/02/1998 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Texas, The State Of | Criminal - State of Texas | Wendy Koster |
Perez, Efrain Sandoval | Criminal - Appellant | Renie Mcclellan |
Trial Court Information
204th Judicial District Court
Dallas
F94-58904-Q
20 YRS TDC/$144.50 CT COST