Case: 01-94-00281-CR
01-94-00281-CR
03/18/1994
Assault & battery
Meadows, Robert S.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/27/1997 | Motion for leave to file | Motion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06) | |
01/23/1997 | Motion for leave to file | | |
11/15/1996 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
11/15/1996 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
10/31/1996 | Case file returned from higher Court or agency. | | |
10/09/1996 | Petition for discretionary review disposed | Refused | |
07/01/1996 | Case file received by higher Court or agency. | | |
06/27/1996 | Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency | | |
06/20/1996 | Motion for leave to file | Motion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06) | |
06/15/1996 | Writ Due | | |
06/11/1996 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed | | |
06/03/1996 | Motion for leave to file | | |
05/31/1996 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |
05/16/1996 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
05/16/1996 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
03/25/1996 | Submitted | | |
03/25/1996 | Submission | | |
03/25/1996 | Submitted | | |
02/12/1996 | Motion for leave to file | Motion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06) | |
01/03/1996 | Motion for leave to file | | |
12/06/1995 | Submission | | |
10/06/1995 | Brief Due | | |
10/06/1995 | Brief filed-oral argument has been waived | | |
10/06/1995 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/06/1995 | Case ready to be set | | |
09/11/1995 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
08/14/1995 | Order entered | Grant motion | |
08/03/1995 | Motion for leave to file | | |
07/25/1995 | Case file returned from higher Court or agency. | | |
07/25/1995 | Case reinstated | | |
07/25/1995 | Submitted | | |
07/25/1995 | Case reinstated | | |
07/14/1995 | Mandate issued | | |
06/28/1995 | Petition for discretionary review disposed | Grant motion | |
04/28/1995 | Case file received by higher Court or agency. | | |
04/25/1995 | Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency | | |
04/10/1995 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed | | |
03/24/1995 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |
03/09/1995 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
03/09/1995 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
02/28/1995 | Submitted | | |
02/28/1995 | Submission | | |
02/28/1995 | Submitted | | |
02/02/1995 | Motion to obtain record (generally pro se) | Motion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06) | |
01/23/1995 | Motion to obtain record (generally pro se) | | |
12/21/1994 | Submission | | |
11/14/1994 | Brief filed-oral argument has been waived | | |
11/14/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
11/14/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/27/1994 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
10/19/1994 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
09/22/1994 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
09/22/1994 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
09/12/1994 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
08/11/1994 | Motion to extend time to file state of facts disp | Grant motion | |
08/11/1994 | Statement of facts filed | | |
08/03/1994 | Motion to extend time to file statement of facts | | |
07/26/1994 | Brief due for retained counsel | | |
05/26/1994 | Motion to extend time to file state of facts disp | Grant motion | |
05/16/1994 | Motion to extend time to file statement of facts | | |
05/16/1994 | Transcript filed | | |
03/18/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
03/17/1994 | Date of Sentence in Criminal Case | | |
03/17/1994 | Notice of appeal filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/15/1996 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
MEADOWS, ROBERT S. | Criminal - Appellant | Henry L. Burkholder III |
MEADOWS, ROBERT | Criminal - Appellant | Robert Meadows |
TEXAS, THE STATE OF | Criminal - State of Texas | John B. Holmes |
Trial Court Information
232nd District Court
Harris
634,048
99 yrs tdc