Case Information: 39300 | |||
Short Caption: | SANTOYA (JAMES) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 40538 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR011190 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 01/24/2003 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/07/2002 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/07/2002 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 02-04156 | |
03/27/2002 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. | 02-05456 | |
04/15/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. If appellant is indigent, the district court shall have 30 days within which to appoint counsel for appellant. Otherwise, the district court shall order that, within 30 days, appellant must retain counsel and counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. Within 5 days from appointment or appearance of counsel the district court clerk shall transmit to this court a copy of the district court's written or minute order, and serve a copy of this order on appellant's counsel. Thereafter, counsel shall have 10 days to file a notice of appearance in this court. fn1[All filing deadlines shall commence to run from the date on which counsel is required to enter an appearance in this court.] | 02-06643 | |
06/25/2002 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on June 19, 2002, appointing Washoe County Public Defender as counsel for appellant. | 02-10959 | |
06/26/2002 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Cheryl Bond, Deputy Washoe Public Defender, gives notice that the Washoe County Public Defender's Office has been appointed to represent Appellant, James Santoya. | 02-11013 | |
06/26/2002 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 02-11014 | |
07/11/2002 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 02-11887 | |
10/28/2002 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: November 25, 2002. | 02-18506 | |
11/21/2002 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: 11/20/02. | 02-20086 | |
11/21/2002 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 02-20088 | |
12/10/2002 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: 12/09/02. | 02-21086 | |
12/10/2002 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. Supplemental Joint Appendix. | 02-21087 | |
01/22/2003 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed. | ||
01/24/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 03-01316 | |
01/24/2003 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
04/21/2003 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment conviction AFFIRMED." Maupin, J. and Gibbons, J. Rose, J., dissenting. NNP03-RR/WM/MG | 03-06713 | |
05/16/2003 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 03-06790 | |
05/16/2003 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/27/2003 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 20, 2003. | 03-06790 |