Case Information: 34262 | |||
Short Caption: | HOUSE (GREGORY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR981720 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/26/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/26/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-04375 | |
06/03/1999 | Order/Counsel | Filed Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Jeremy Bosler shall file the transcript request form within10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. | 99-04605 | |
06/14/1999 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 99-05057 | |
07/06/1999 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 99-05969 | |
07/06/1999 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 99-05970 | |
07/15/1999 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Confession of Error. | 99-06321 | |
11/17/1999 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Remand. " . . . we remand to the district court with instructions to vacate appellant's sentence and hold a new sentencing hearing before a different district court judge." Upon remand, if the sentencing judge pronounces a sentence that exceeds the sentence imposed by judge Kosach, said sentence shall be automatically reduced to conform with Judge Kosach's lesser sentence. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML | 99-11394 | |
12/14/1999 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 99-12559 | |
12/14/1999 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/05/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 3, 2000. | 99-12559 |