Case Information: 34273 | |||
Short Caption: | MYERS (GINA) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 9801316C | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/22/2000 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/28/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/28/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 99-04430 | |
06/07/1999 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 9/28/98, 10/12/98, 3/30/99, 3/31/99, 5/10/99. Court Reporter: Julietta Forbes. | 99-04738 | |
06/25/1999 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement due: July 6, 1999. | 99-05611 | |
07/06/1999 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 99-05938 | |
07/22/1999 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: August 2, 1999. | 99-06641 | |
08/02/1999 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 99-07063 | |
08/02/1999 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Respondent's Answering Appendix. | 99-07064 | |
09/30/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Full Briefing. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Opening brief and appendix due: 40 days. fn2[We suspend the requirement in NRAP9 for counsel to file a certified transcript.] Answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. | 99-09414 | |
11/09/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: December 9, 1999. | 99-11061 | |
12/09/1999 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Hand delivered: Reno/Carson Messenger 12/09/99. | 99-12363 | |
12/09/1999 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Hand delivered: Reno/Carson Messenger 12/09/99. | 99-12364 | |
01/07/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: February 7, 2000. | 00-00315 | |
02/07/2000 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 2/7/00. | 00-01940 | |
03/08/2000 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 3/8/00. | 00-03669 | |
03/22/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. | 00-04562 | |
03/22/2000 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
07/07/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML | 00-11607 | |
08/01/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-13267 | |
08/01/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/04/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 2, 2000. | 00-13267 |