Case: A-4847
A-4847
07/29/1954
Application for Writ of Error
EDWIN K. ATWOOD, ET AL.
WILLACY COUNTY NAVIGATION DISTRICT
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/17/1955 | Brief in Support of Petition | Petitioner | | |
12/08/1954 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
08/31/1954 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
07/29/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/10/1955 | Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed. | | ||
03/29/1955 | Affidavit filed | | ||
01/19/1955 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
01/17/1955 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed | | ||
01/17/1955 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
12/08/1954 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed | | ||
12/08/1954 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
08/31/1954 | Response to Petition | | ||
07/29/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
07/29/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Edwin K. Atwood, et al. | Petitioner | |
Willacy County Navigation District | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information