judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-4840
A-4840
07/27/1954
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF HOUSTON
MARY E. ADAMS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/13/1954Supplement to ResponseRespondent
09/16/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
07/27/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/11/1955Opinion issued
11/18/1954Letter Filed
11/13/1954Supplement to Response
10/06/1954Document received (See Remarks)
09/16/1954Response to Petition
07/27/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/27/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City of HoustonPetitioner
Mary E. AdamsRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information