judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GRAYBAR ELECTRIC VS. CARROLL

Case Information: 34271
Short Caption:GRAYBAR ELECTRIC VS. CARROLLCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A399316Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:BeckerCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/08/1999 / Allf, NancySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/28/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Becker. Sat in district court proceedings.
05/28/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Barker Brown Busby Crisman & Thomas--check no. 9923.
05/28/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-04429
06/02/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Judgment on Jury Verdict filed 11/19/98. Due Date: 10 days
06/08/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Nancy L. Allf. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
06/14/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-05127
07/20/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 11/10/98 through 11/19/98 (7 volumes). Court Reporter: Alice F. Eastgate. 99-06487
07/26/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order or judgment appealed from filed in district court on: 12/9/98. 99-06744
09/07/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-08369
12/09/1999MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 99-12336
12/15/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. SNP/CLK 99-12617
12/15/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.
01/10/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 00-00419
01/14/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 00-00646