Case: A-4871
A-4871
07/22/1954
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
L. H. ODOM
T. O. LANG, SHERIFF OF TRAVIS COUNTY, TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/23/1954 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
08/20/1954 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
08/19/1954 | Brief in Support of Petition | Petitioner | | |
08/13/1954 | Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/20/1954 | Opinion issued | | ||
08/23/1954 | Reply to Response | | ||
08/20/1954 | Response to Petition | | ||
08/19/1954 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
08/14/1954 | Bond | | ||
08/13/1954 | Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed | | ||
08/12/1954 | motion for leave to file petition | | ||
07/22/1954 | Order from Lower Court filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
L. H. Odom | Petitioner | |
T. O. Lang, Sheriff of Travis County, Texas | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information