judyrecords
search tips
730 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GRIFFIN (STANFORD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34254
Short Caption:GRIFFIN (STANFORD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33330
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C119189Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/09/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/24/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/24/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-04288
07/30/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This court directs the attorney general to obtain and transmit to the clerk of this court, within 30 days from the date of this order, certified copies of any available prison records indicating the actual date upon which appellant delivered his notice of appeal to a prison official. 99-06954
08/20/1999MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 99-07815
09/02/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 99-08231
12/09/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on: 12/07/99. 99-12373
12/09/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/16/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-04695
04/11/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-04807
04/11/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/11/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 7, 2001. 01-04807