Case: A-4848
A-4848
07/29/1954
Application for Writ of Error
ERNEST G. WADEL
AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/04/1954 | Brief in Support of Petition | Petitioner | | |
08/20/1954 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
07/29/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/25/1955 | Motion to dismiss | Filing granted | | |
12/04/1954 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
10/27/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
08/20/1954 | Response to Petition | | ||
07/29/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
07/29/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. | Respondent | |
Ernest G. Wadel | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information