judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WASHINGTON, ALICIA J. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-0680
Short Caption:WASHINGTON, ALICIA J. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2377-80Filed Date:05/15/1981

Opening Event Date:05/15/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/12/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/11/1984
Argued/Submitted:11/14/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Lois Yankowski YN
AppellantJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WASHINGTON, ALICIA J. UNITED STATES
05/15/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/12/1982FiledRecord Completed
07/11/1984FiledBriefing Completed
11/14/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
08/02/1985FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition