judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

VERNON McKENNEY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-207)
Case Number:06-207Case Docketed On:09/07/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:VERNON McKENNEY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:VERNON McKENNEY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantVernon McKenneyMike Cornia
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Cara Boyle Chambers

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 129
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/07/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/07/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/07/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/07/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/20/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/20/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/08/2006Brief - Appellant; and received copy on disk.BriefAppellantFinal
01/05/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/08/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appelleeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/05/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
03/07/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
03/19/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
03/19/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/23/2007Notice-Incoming - Filing of recordNotice-IncomingFiling of recordFinal
03/23/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, one volume: Volume I, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/23/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
03/26/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
08/09/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/20/2007Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
08/20/2007Brief - Other - in support of petition for rehearingBriefOtherFinal
08/29/2007Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
08/29/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/29/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/29/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/04/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 8/31/07 by Laura Tueller.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal