judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MANN (RAYMOND) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36196
Short Caption:MANN (RAYMOND) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - PC2702Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/08/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/31/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/31/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09169
08/04/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 00-13533
12/08/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 3. 00-21525
12/08/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/19/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due from the State: 30 days from the date of this order. 01-19283
02/04/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (file response to order). 02-02315
02/13/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed February 4, 2002. The clerk of this court shall file the State's response provisionally submitted on February 4, 2002. 02-02838
02/13/2002MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 02-02316
05/17/2002Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." fn17[Because we conclude that an evidentiary hearing is necessary, we decline to reach the merits of any of the other claims that Mann raised in the instant petition. We have also considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that no further relief is warranted at this time. We also conclude that oral argument and briefing are unwarranted in this matter.] Before Shearing, Rose and Becker, JJ. Per Curiam. 118 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 36. NNP02 02-08709
06/11/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-09061
06/11/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/17/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 12, 2002. 02-09061