judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-4860
A-4860
08/05/1954
Application for Writ of Error
CONSOLIDATED CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
REX PERKINS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/17/1955Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/10/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
08/05/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/24/1955Response to Motion filed
05/17/1955Motion for Rehearing
05/04/1955Opinion issued
11/10/1954Response to Petition
11/10/1954Document received (See Remarks)
11/10/1954Document received (See Remarks)
11/10/1954Document received (See Remarks)
11/10/1954Document received (See Remarks)
11/10/1954Document received (See Remarks)
08/05/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Consolidated Casualty Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Rex PerkinsRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information