judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BALTIMORE, ROBERT L. B.F. GOODRICH COMPANY

Case Information: 84-CV-1214
Short Caption:BALTIMORE, ROBERT L. B.F. GOODRICH COMPANYClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA1090-79Filed Date:08/31/1984

Opening Event Date:08/31/1984Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/26/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/14/1985
Argued/Submitted:03/07/1985
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
John T. Irick YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Ronald G. GuziakYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BALTIMORE, ROBERT L. B.F. GOODRICH COMPANY
08/31/1984FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/26/1984FiledRecord Completed
01/14/1985FiledBriefing Completed
03/07/1985FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/16/1985FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition