Case: A-4858
A-4858
08/04/1954
Application for Writ of Error
CHARLES MERZBACHER, JR., ET UX.
PAUL T. KIRK, DBA PAUL T. KIRK REAL ESTATE
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/10/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
08/12/1954 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
08/04/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/18/1954 | Letter Filed | | ||
11/29/1954 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
11/10/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Overruled | | |
08/12/1954 | Response to Petition | | ||
08/05/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
08/04/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Paul T. Kirk, dba Paul T. Kirk Real Estate | Respondent | |
Charles Merzbacher, Jr., et ux. | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information