Case: A-4861
A-4861
08/06/1954
Application for Writ of Error
RENWAR OIL CORPORATION
E. L. LANCASTER, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/23/1955 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
08/06/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/23/1955 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
03/09/1955 | Opinion issued | | ||
12/30/1954 | Amendment to Motion filed | | ||
12/15/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
12/15/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
12/15/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
08/26/1954 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
08/17/1954 | Motion to dismiss | | ||
08/06/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
08/06/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
E. L. Lancaster, et al. | Respondent | |
Renwar Oil Corporation | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information