Case Information: 34241 | |||
Short Caption: | THOMAS VS. STATE, TRANSPORTATION | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - CV9700759A | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 05/27/1999 / Jenkins, Nathan | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/20/1999 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Whitehead & Whitehead--check no. 1984. | ||
05/20/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 99-04195 | |
05/27/1999 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Nathan M. Jenkins. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
06/03/1999 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 99-04635 | |
08/12/1999 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. (Contingent upon approval by the State Board of Examiners within 60 days). | 99-07479 | |
09/07/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have tentatively agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellants shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss this appeal or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. | 99-08342 | |
11/22/1999 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulated Request for Dismissal Pursuant to NRAP 42(b). | 99-11625 | |
12/09/1999 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. SNP/CLK | 99-12356 | |
12/09/1999 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |