Case Information: 34259 | |||
Short Caption: | HUDSON VS. CAPPS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 35713 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Churchill Co. - Tenth Judicial District - 25405 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 05/28/1999 / Buchanan, William | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/25/1999 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Law Office of Rick Lawton--check no. 6458. | ||
05/25/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 99-04326 | |
05/28/1999 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
06/15/1999 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. Returned, unfiled with letter: the original and one copy of the docketing statement (handwritten). | ||
06/21/1999 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 99-05371 | |
08/30/1999 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 99-08131 | |
09/28/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Pursuant to NRAP 16(g), the settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nevertheless, the time deadlines for requesting and preparing transcripts and briefing shall remain suspended pending a jurisdictional review of this appeal and futher order of this court. | 99-09241 | |
10/18/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Response due: 30 days from the date of this order. The preparation of transcripts and briefing schedule in this appeal shall remain suspended pending further order of this court. | 99-10066 | |
10/27/1999 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | 99-10520 | |
12/07/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Response due: 10 days of the date of this order. Failure to respond appropriately to this order may result in immediate sanctions, including but not limited to dismissal of this appeal. The preparation of transcripts and briefing schedule shall remain suspended pending further order of this court. | 99-12225 | |
12/13/1999 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. Letter from Rick Lawton law office enclosing copies of several district court documents. | 99-12525 | |
02/11/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[If the district court enters an order resolving the tolling motion, appellant may timely file a notice of appeal from that order.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB | 00-02161 | |
03/08/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-03650 | |
03/08/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/22/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 10, 2000. |