Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/25/1999 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Agosti. Sat in district court proceedings. | | |
05/25/1999 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Kevin J. Mirch, Ltd.--check no. 3037. | | |
05/25/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 99-04306 |
05/28/1999 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | | |
06/03/1999 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 1/11/99 to 2/2/99. To Court Reporter: Dept. 10 | | 99-04649 |
06/08/1999 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 99-04813 |
06/11/1999 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Association of Counsel. Law firm of Lemons, Grundy & Eisenberg to represent respondents Star Insurance Company, Meadowbrook Inc., Frontier Surety & American Insurance. | | 99-05033 |
08/11/1999 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Affidavit. Affidavit of Court Reporter Debbie P. Vieira. | | 99-07418 |
08/13/1999 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. | | |
09/09/1999 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 99-08486 |
09/29/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Pursuant to NRAP 16(g), the settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nevertheless, the time deadlines for requesting and preparing transcripts and briefing shall remain suspended pending a jurisdictional review of this appeal and further order of this court. On August 11, 1999, court reporter Debbie P. Vieira filed an affidavit pursuant to NRAP 9(b)(2) regarding preparation of the trial transcript. Court reporter Vieira may, at such future time as this court lifts the suspension of transcript preparation, file an appropriate motion and affidavit regarding the filing of the transcripts. | | 99-09330 |
09/29/1999 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. | | 99-09354 |
10/11/1999 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. Letter from attorney Paul Hamilton requesting further modifications to the caption. | | 99-09806 |
10/18/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Response due: 30 days from the date of this order. The preparation of transcripts and briefing schedule in this appeal shall remain suspended pending further order of this court. | | 99-10069 |
11/17/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Enlargement of Time in which to Respond to Order to Show Cause. | | 99-11441 |
12/01/1999 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Change of Address for law firm of Lemons, Grundy & Eisenberg. | | 99-12003 |
12/14/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Response due: December 17, 1999. | | 99-12605 |
12/15/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Enlargement of Time in which to Respond to Order to Show Cause (Second Request). | | 99-12703 |
12/17/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Motion Granted in Part. The appellant shall have until December 30, 1999, to file a response to the order to show cause. | | 99-12813 |
12/30/1999 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | | 99-13456 |
01/12/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Response due from appellants: 30 days from the date of this order. The preparation of transcripts and briefing scheduled in this appeal shall remains suspended pending further order of this court. | | 00-00484 |
02/11/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Enlargement of Time in Which to Respond to Order to Show Cause. | | 00-02227 |
03/03/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants shall have until March 10, 2000, to file their response. No further extensions will be permitted. | | 00-03390 |
03/10/2000 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Change of Firm Address. | | 00-03832 |
03/10/2000 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | | 00-03835 |
03/15/2000 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 1/6/99, 1/7/99, 1/11/99, 1/14/99, 1/15/99, 1/19/99, 1/20/99, 1/21/99, 1/22/99, 1/25/99, 1/26/99, 1/27/99, 1/28/99, 1/29/99, 1/30/99, 2/1/99, 2/2/99. Court Reporter: Debbie P. Vieira. | | 00-04141 |
05/10/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Appellants shall have 10 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Appellants must also show cause why sanctions should not be imposed for their failure to respond properly to this court's prior two orders to show cause. The preparation of transcripts and briefing schedule in this appeal shall rremain suspended pending further order of this court. | | 00-07722 |
05/22/2000 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | | 00-08563 |
06/07/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Briefing Reinstated. fn1[Although it appears that counsel was careless on two occasions in responding to this court's orders to show cause, we decline to impose sanctions in this instance. We warn counsel that they just be more diligent in the future in responding to this court's orders to show cause.] It appears that we have jurisdiction to consider this appeal. Appellants shall have 70 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | | 00-09608 |
08/09/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 00-13844 |
08/17/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Extending Time. Brief due: October 16, 2000. | | 00-14385 |
09/14/2000 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Appointment of Receivership for Appellant Zdenek Kieslich. | | 00-16286 |
10/16/2000 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 10/16/00. | | 00-18361 |
10/16/2000 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 5. | | 00-18362 |
10/17/2000 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. To Kevin J. Mirch to file Amended Appellant's Opening Brief. Missing Table of Authorities. Due date: 10 days. Per AH. | | |
10/20/2000 | Brief | Filed Amended Brief. Amended Opening Brief.
12/15/04 ORDER: AMENDED OPENING BRIEF STRICKEN. | | 00-18653 |
11/03/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Strike. Motion to Strike Appellants' Amended Opening Brief. | | 00-19347 |
11/03/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Suspend Briefing Schedule. | | 00-19348 |
11/15/2000 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Motio to Suspend Briefing Schedule. | | 00-20070 |
11/15/2000 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Strike Appellants' Amended Opening Brief. | | 00-20071 |
11/15/2000 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Compliance. Amended Certificate of Compliance. | | 00-20073 |
11/17/2000 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Entry of Order by the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas of Appointment of Permanent Receiver for Zdenek Kieslich and Order Granting Preliminary Injunction against Zdenek Kieslich. | | 00-20282 |
12/13/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to inform this court, in writing, what impact, if any, the U.S. District Court orders have on this appeal. We order the briefing schedule suspended pending resolution of this matter. We defer ruling on respondents' motion to strike appellants' amended opening brief until after appellants have responded to this order. As we have already suspended briefing, we deny, as moot, respondents' motion to suspend briefing schedule. | | 00-21754 |
01/12/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Enlargement of Time in which to Inform Court of Impact of U.S. District Court Orders in Re Appeal (First Request). | | 01-00818 |
01/17/2001 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. in response to order filed 12/13/00. | | 01-01062 |
01/24/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Enlargement of Time in Which to Inform Court of Impact of U.S. District Court Orders in Re Appeal (Second Request). | | 01-01579 |
02/05/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file their response to our December 13, 2000, order. On January 17, 2001, Joseph J. Wielebinski, the receiver appointed for appellant Zdenek Kieslich, submitted a letter in response to our December 13, 2000, order. Receipt of receiver Wielebinski's letter does not relieve appellants from the responsibility of responding to our December 13, 2000, order. This court, however, may review receiver Wielebinski's letter when taking this matter under consideration. We direct the clerk of this court to file the letter received January 17, 2001. | | 01-02291 |
02/05/2001 | Other | Other. Filed Letter received on January 17, 2001, in response to order filed December 13, 2000. (Letter from Joseph J. Wielebinski, the receiver appointed for appellant Zdenek Kieslich.) | | 01-01062 |
02/13/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Enlargement of Time in which to Inform Court of Impact of U.S. District Court Orders in re Appeal (Fourth Request) Due to Extraordinary and Special Circumstances. | | 01-02851 |
03/01/2001 | Other | Other. Received Appellants' Response to Court Order Dated December 13, 2000. | | 01-03836 |
07/31/2001 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Filing Bankruptcy Petition. | | 01-12925 |
08/02/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We grant appellants' motion filed on February 13, 2001. The clerk of this court shall file the response received on March 1, 2001. Our review of the documents filed with this court indicate that all appellants are similarly situated, are represented by the same attorney and are raising substantially similar issues on appeal. We conclude that proceeding with this appeal as to all appellants except for Zdenek Kieslich would not be appropriate. Briefing of this appeal shall remain suspended pending lifting of the stay imposed by the U.S. District Court. On October 20, 2000, appellants file an amended opening brief. On November 3, 2000, respondents filed a motion to strike the amended opening brief. We defer ruling on respondents' motion until the stay has been lifted. | | 01-13069 |
08/02/2001 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellants' Response to Court Order Dated December 13, 2000. | | 01-03836 |
10/22/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On July 31, 2001, respondents filed a Notice of Filing Bankruptcy Petiton. Our review of the records below indicates that appellant Dan D. Love was a plaintiff in the underlying action. We conclude that this appeal is not subject to the automatic stay. Nevertheless, pursuant to our August 2, 2001, order, briefing of this appeal shall remain suspended pending lifting of the stay imposed by the U.S. District Court. | | 01-17720 |
04/29/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Status Report. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to inform this court of the status of the stay imposed by the United States District Court. If the stay has been lifted, the status report shall be accompanied by a copy of the order lifting the stay. | | 03-07237 |
05/30/2003 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Status Report. Appellant's Status Report. | | 03-09051 |
12/09/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Status Report. On May 30, 2003, appellants filed an updated status report regarding the United States District Court injunction. Without additional documentation, this court is unable to determine whether the briefing of this appeal should remain stayed. We request the receiver, Joseph J. Wielebinski, to provide this court with a status report regarding the receivership within 45 days from the date of this order. We specifically request Mr. Wielebinski to inform this court whether the District Court injunction remains in effect. If the injunction has been lifted we request Mr. Wielebinski to provide this court with a copy of the order lifting the injunction. We further request Mr. Wielebinski to provide this court with a copy of an order approving the settlement between Mr. Kieslich and Meadowbrook, if any exists. If such an order does not exist, we request Mr. Wielebinski to inform this court of the terms of the settlement, if possible. | | 03-20502 |
01/27/2004 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Receiver's Response to Court's Order Requesting Status Report. | | 04-01722 |
03/17/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Because it appears that Mr. Wielebinski may be the only available representative for Mr. Kieslich's estate, he shall have 30 days from the date of this order to do one of the following: (1) file a motion to substitute himself, as receiver of Mr. Kieslich's estate, as appellant in this appeal; (2) inform this court that he does not have the proper authority to represent Mr. Kieslich's estate for the purposes of this appeal; or (3) inform this court that he does not wish to proceed with this appeal on Mr. Kieslich's behalf. Should Mr. Wielebinski inform this court that he does not wish to proceed with Mr. Kieslich's appeal, his appeal will be dismissed as abandoned and the briefing of this appeal will be reinstated. | | 04-05012 |
04/19/2004 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from Counsel for Receiver Ross H. Parker in response to this court's order filed March 17, 2004. | | 04-07122 |
08/06/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Mr. Wielebinski responded to our March 17, 2004, order by letter dated April 16, 2004. Mr. Wielebinski shall have 60 days from the date of this order to do one of the following: (1) reach an agreement with Mr. Mirch (or another licensed Nevada attorney) to represent Mr. Wielebinski in this matter and file a motion to substitute himself, as receiver of Mr. Kieslich's estate, as appellant in this appeal; or (2) inform this court that he does not wish to proceed with this appeal on Mr. Kieslich's behalf. Should Mr. Wielebinski fail to file a motion to substitute himself, as receiver of Mr. Kieslich's estate, as appellant in this appeal, or should Mr. Wielebinski inform this court that he does not wish to proceed with Mr. Kieslich's appeal, his appeal will be dismissed as abandoned and the briefing of this appeal will be reinstated. | | 04-14247 |
12/15/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Dismissing Appeal of Appellant Zdenek Kieslich, Reinstating Briefing, and Granting Motion to Strike Amended Opening Brief. After an unsuccessful settlement conference and a delay in briefing to determine whether this court had jurisdiction to consider this appeal, the opening brief and appendix were filed on October 16, 2000. At this court's direction, appellant filed an amended opening brief on October 20, 2000. Respondents filed a motion to strike the amended opening brief. Appellants opposed the motion. On December 13, 2000, we suspended briefing in this appeal and deferred ruling on respondents' motion to strike appellants' amended opening brief. At this court's request, the receiver, Joseph J. Wielebinski, and appellants' counsel have provided status reports regarding the federal court's injunction during the past four years. In a status report filed by the receiver on January 27, 2004, we learned that Kieslich had died on January 28, 2003. On March 17, 2004, we entered an order acknowledging that Mr. Kieslich had died. Mr. Wielebinski responded to our order of March 17, 2004, by letter dated April 16, 2004. We cautioned Mr. Wielebinski that if he failed to file a motion to substitute himself, as receiver of Mr. Kieslich's estate, as appellant in this appeal, or informed this court that he did not wish to proceed with Mr. Kieslich's appeal, then Mr. Kieslich's appeal would be dismissed as abandoned and the briefing of this appeal would be reinstated. To date, Mr. Wielebinski has not responded to our August 6, 2004, order. This case has been on this court's docket for more than five years. Because Mr. Kieslich died during the pendency of this appeal and the receiver of his estate apparently is unwilling to substitute himself as an appellant, any decision by this court in this appeal would be a nullity so far as concerns Mr. Kieslich's interests. And during the extensive delay in this case related to the Kieslich injunction and death, the interests of the remaining four appellants and the respondents have lingered without resolution. Under the circumstances, we conclude that this appeal should be dismissed as to appellant Kieslich. Furthermore, we reinstate the briefing of this appeal. We therefore must resolve the pending motion to strike the amended opening brief. Although it appears that there are appropriate references to the trial transcripts in support of factual statements in the legal argument portions of the amended opening brief, the initial six-page 'factual history' in the brief and the limited factual statements in the remaining portions of the brief are insufficient to give this court a clear statement of the relevant facts. We therefore grant the motion to strike the amended opening brief. Appellants shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file and serve a second amended opening brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | | 04-22839 |
01/06/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. | | |
02/15/2005 | Brief | Filed Amended Brief. Appellant's Second Amended Opening Brief.
STRICKEN PER 06/15/05 ORDER. | | 05-03007 |
03/22/2005 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: April 20, 2005. | | 05-05632 |
03/25/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. to Washoe County Clerk regarding transmission of transcript for the morning and afternoon pleadings for January 13, 1999. | | |
03/30/2005 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 01/13/99 (2 vols. - morning and afternoon sessons) Court Reporter: Mildred J. Terry. | | 05-06257 |
04/12/2005 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Stipulation Regarding Briefing and Appendix. | | 05-07123 |
04/13/2005 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. (Stipulation Regarding Briefing and Appendix). | | 05-07273 |
04/14/2005 | Appendix | Received Appendix. Supplement to Appendix to Appellant's/Peititoners' Opening Brief Volume 6. | | 05-07284 |
05/06/2005 | Brief | Received Amended Brief. Appellant's Third Amended Opening Brief. | | 05-08921 |
06/07/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to file Answering Brief. | | 05-11166 |
06/15/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. the clerk of this court shall strike the second amended opening brief filed on February 15, 2005, file the supplemental appendix received on April 14, 2005, and file the third amended opening brief received on May 6, 2005. Respondents shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. We admonish appellants' counsel for repeatedly filing inadequate briefs and we caution counsel that failure to strictly adhere to our appellate rules in the future may result in the imposition of sanctions. | | 05-11748 |
06/15/2005 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Supplement to Appendix to Appellant's/Peititoners' Opening Brief Volume 6. | | 05-07284 |
06/15/2005 | Brief | Filed Amended Brief. Appellant's Third Amended Opening Brief.
12/07/05 Order: Third Amended Opening Brief-STRICKEN.jcr | | 05-08921 |
07/18/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: August 15, 2005. | | 05-14255 |
07/26/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion to Strike. Motion to Strike Third Amended Opening Brief and to Dismiss Appeal. | | 05-14837 |
08/05/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Enlargement of Time in which to file Opposition to Motion to Strike Third Amended Opening Brief and to Dismiss Appeal (First Request.) | | 05-15599 |
08/16/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Suspend Briefing Schedule Pending Outcome of Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | | 05-16230 |
08/30/2005 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. To Suspend Briefing Schedule Pending Outcome of Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | | 05-17207 |
12/07/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Respondents have moved to strike the third amended opening brief and to dismiss this appeal. The clerk shall file the opposition received on September 7, 2005. Appellants request permission to file the fourth amended opening brief. As a result of counsels' continuing failure to file adequate briefs we conclude that counsel's conduct under these circumstances warrants the imposition of sanctions. We note that one of appellants' attorneys, Mr. Kevin Mirch, was previously sanctioned in the amount of $1,000 for failing to provide citations to the record on appeal in his opening and reply briefs. We conclude that a sanction is appropriate here. Appellants' counsel shall have 15 days from the date of this order to personally pay the sum of $1,500.00 to the law firm of Lemons Grundy & Eisenberg to defray the expenses incurred in filing the motions to strike, to suspend briefing and to dismiss this appeal. Within that same time period, appellants' counsel shall file proof of such payment with the clerk of this court. We direct the clerk to strike the third amended opening brief and to file the fourth amended opening brief received from appellants on September 7, 2005. If our subsequent review of the brief reveals additional violations of our appellate rules, we may impose additional sanctions, including further monetary sanctions and referral to the State Bar of Nevada pursuant to SCR 105. We deny respondents' request to dismiss this appeal. Respondents have also filed a motion to suspend the briefing schedule. We grant respondents' motion to the extent that respondents shall file the answering brief within 30 days of the date of this order. | | 05-23913 |
12/07/2005 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Strike Third Amended Opening Brief and Opposition to Dismiss Appeal. | | 05-17710 |
12/07/2005 | Brief | Filed Amended Brief. Appellant's Fourth Amended Opening Brief. | | 05-17711 |
12/09/2005 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Compliance with Court's Order Dated December 7, 2005. (re: sanctions) | | 05-24131 |
01/09/2006 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: February 6, 2006. | | 06-00563 |
01/30/2006 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Renewed Motion to Dismiss Appeal and for Sanctions. | | 06-02200 |
02/08/2006 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 06-02806 |
02/08/2006 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Compliance. (for Appellant's Fourth Amended Opening Brief) | | 06-02858 |
02/08/2006 | Motion | Filed Motion to Strike. Appellant's Motion to Strike and Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Renewed Motion for Sanctions. | | 06-02859 |
02/13/2006 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. | | 06-03118 |
03/07/2006 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 44 pages. | | 06-04990 |
03/29/2006 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 06-06628 |
04/27/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the answering brief and appendix received on March 7, 2006. Reply brief due: June 14, 2006. | | 06-08959 |
04/27/2006 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. clerk1
01/08/07 Order: add citations to the answering brief at page 2, lines 20-21 (166-67, 179). | | 06-04991 |
04/27/2006 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. Volumes 1 and 2. | | 06-04992 |
05/16/2006 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Hardesty. Law firm of Mirch & Mirch. | | |
05/16/2006 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (Second Request). | | 06-10315 |
05/19/2006 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. | | 06-10616 |
08/25/2006 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (Third Request) | | 06-17742 |
10/09/2006 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Enlargement of Time in which to File Appellants' Reply Brief and Request to File Medical Records under Seal (Fourth Request). (Sealed envelope containing "Medical Records under Seal" attached to motion.)clerk3
01/08/07 Order: detached Exhibit A and returned unfiled.jcr | | 06-20583 |
11/07/2006 | Brief | Received Reply Brief. | | 06-22749 |
11/16/2006 | Motion | Filed Motion. Respondents' Motion to Supplement Citations in Answering Brief. | | 06-23555 |
01/08/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We deny respondents' renewed motion to dismiss this appeal and for sanctions, and we deny appellants' motion to strike respondents' renewed motion. This court will disregard any arguments improperly included in the parties' briefs. We grant the motions for extensions of time. The clerk shall file the reply brief received on November 7, 2006. We deny the request to file copies of Mr. Mirch's medical records under seal. The clerk shall return to appellants' counsel, unfiled, the medical records submitted as Exhibit A to appellants' motion filed on October 9, 2006. On November 16, 2006, respondents filed a motion to supplement citations in the answering brief. We grant the unopposed motion. The clerk shall add citations to the answering brief at page 2, lines 20-21 (166-67, 179). | | 07-00434 |
01/08/2007 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. the medical records submitted as Exhibit A to appellants' motion filed on October 9, 2006, to Mirch & Mirch. | | |
01/08/2007 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | | 06-22749 |
07/20/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on September 18, 2007 at 9:30 a.m. (SNP08-WM/RP/MD) | | 07-15858 |
09/04/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 07-19379 |
09/18/2007 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP08-WM/RP/MD | | |
11/07/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP08-WM/RP/MD. | | 07-24347 |
12/04/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 07-26036 |
12/04/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
12/19/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 6, 2007. | | 07-26036 |