Case: 07-01-00217-CV
07-01-00217-CV
05/21/2001
Miscellaneous civil
Monty London d/b/a/ London Cabinet & Trim; Citicorp Mortgage, Inc., Nabil Attaya, and Adila Attaya's
Trinity Floor Company
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/21/2009 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |||||||
06/27/2002 | Mandate Issued | | |||||||
04/01/2002 | Opinion issued | Dismissed-Want of Jurisdiction |
| ||||||
03/04/2002 | Submitted | | |||||||
02/08/2002 | Submission | | |||||||
10/22/2001 | Supplemental Brief Filed | | |||||||
10/05/2001 | Response to any order, inquiry or motion | | |||||||
09/28/2001 | Letter of Inquiry filed | | |||||||
09/28/2001 | Supplemental Brief Filed | | |||||||
09/27/2001 | Response to any order, inquiry or motion | | |||||||
09/17/2001 | Motion For Supplemental Brief Filed | | |||||||
08/31/2001 | Supplemental Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||||
08/27/2001 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
08/27/2001 | Brief Filed | | |||||||
08/27/2001 | Brief received | | |||||||
07/24/2001 | Brief Filed | | |||||||
07/24/2001 | Brief received | | |||||||
06/28/2001 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||||
06/22/2001 | Extension request for clerk's record | GRANT | | ||||||
05/21/2001 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |||||||
05/21/2001 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/27/2002 | Case Stored | Case stored |
09/01/2008 | Retention | Date case will be destroyed (6 years after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Citicorp Mortgage, Inc. | Appellant | Kenneth S. Beat |
Trinity Floor Company | Appellee | Karen G. Shropshire Michael H. Carper |
Trial Court Information
99th District Court
Lubbock
Honorable Mackey K. Hancock
99-507,215