Case: 14-01-00672-CR
14-01-00672-CR
07/17/2001
Other Felony
Price, Chad Everett
The State of Texas
No
10th Court of Appeals
08/17/2001
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/19/2001 | Supplemental clerk's record FILED-ANT,APE,STA | | |
09/20/2001 | Reporter's Record Due | | |
08/17/2001 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | GRANTED | |
08/17/2001 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | GRANTED | |
08/13/2001 | Docketing Statement FILED | | |
08/07/2001 | Docketing statement DUE | | |
08/06/2001 | Clerk's Record DUE | | |
08/06/2001 | Clerk's record FILED - APP,STA | | |
08/06/2001 | Extend time to file court reporter record DISPOSED | GRANTED | |
08/06/2001 | Extend time to file court reporter record FILED | | |
08/06/2001 | Record due | | |
07/23/2001 | Clerk's copy of NOA FILED | | |
07/17/2001 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
06/07/2001 | Date of Sentence | | |
06/07/2001 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/17/2001 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
PRICE, CHAD EVERETT | Criminal - Appellant | David Alan Disher |
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Michael J. Guarino |
Trial Court Information
Honorable WAYNE J. MALLIA
00CR1583
Life TDCJ