Case: 12-00-00310-CR
12-00-00310-CR
10/20/2000
Conspiracy to Commit Capital Murder
LaQuita Davis
State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/08/2015 | Letter received |
| |||||
06/15/2015 | Letter received |
| |||||
04/30/2015 | Letter received |
| |||||
05/06/2013 | Telephone call received | | |||||
04/22/2002 | Clerk's Acknowlegement of Mandate | | |||||
04/19/2002 | Mandate Issued |
| |||||
04/19/2002 | Case stored | | |||||
04/03/2002 | Case Returned from Higher Ct. | | |||||
03/22/2002 | Higher Court Decision | Refused | | ||||
03/13/2002 | Higher Court Decision | | |||||
03/06/2002 | Higher Court Decision | Refused | | ||||
12/28/2001 | ACKNOWLEDGMENT CARD RECEIVED FROM APPEAL COURT | | |||||
12/17/2001 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |||||
12/13/2001 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed | | |||||
11/07/2001 | Ext to file PDR disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
11/07/2001 | Order Entered | Ratifiy a trial court`s order | | ||||
11/05/2001 | Supp Record Filed (show in remarks by: CLK or RPT) | | |||||
09/17/2001 | Ext to file PDR disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
09/14/2001 | Petition for discretionary review was not filed | | |||||
08/30/2001 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |||||
08/15/2001 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
08/09/2001 | letter received | | |||||
06/28/2001 | Submitted | | |||||
06/08/2001 | Motion to Withdraw Attorney Disposed | Motion passed | | ||||
06/07/2001 | Submission | | |||||
06/07/2001 | Letter to Submit w/o Argument | | |||||
06/07/2001 | Motion to Withdraw Attorney Filed | | |||||
06/07/2001 | Prescreened | | |||||
06/06/2001 | Motion for Leave to File Late Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
05/24/2001 | Motion for Leave to File Late Brief | | |||||
05/22/2001 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
05/22/2001 | Brief Filed | | |||||
05/22/2001 | Brief Received | | |||||
05/04/2001 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
04/20/2001 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||||
03/23/2001 | Motion for Leave to File Late Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
03/20/2001 | Brief Filed | | |||||
03/20/2001 | Brief Received | | |||||
03/20/2001 | Motion for Leave to File Late Brief | | |||||
02/12/2001 | Reporters Record Filed | | |||||
01/22/2001 | Mot ext time file record disp | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
01/12/2001 | Ext for Record Filed by trct clk, rept, or counsel | | |||||
11/17/2000 | Mot ext time file record disp | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
11/13/2000 | Ext for Record Filed by trct clk, rept, or counsel | | |||||
10/25/2000 | Docketing Statement | | |||||
10/24/2000 | Clerks Record Filed | | |||||
10/20/2000 | Notice for Criminal Docketing Statement | | |||||
10/20/2000 | Notice of appeal received | | |||||
10/05/2000 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||||
09/14/2000 | Date Sentence Given in Open Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/19/2002 | Retention | Criminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value) |
04/19/2002 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Unknown User | Criminal - State of Texas | Mr. Edward J. Marty |
Davis, LaQuita | Criminal - Appellant | LaQuita Davis Mr. Donald F. Killingsworth |
Trial Court Information
241st District Court
Smith
Honorable Diane V. Devasto
241-0851-00
40 years/TDCJ-ID