judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-4991
A-4991
12/09/1954
Application for Writ of Error
ED MEYER
GREAT AMERICAN INDEMNITY COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/16/1955Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
01/05/1955Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
12/20/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
12/09/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/01/1955Opinion issued
02/16/1955Amicus Curiae Brief received
01/05/1955Supplemental Brief filed
12/20/1954Response to Petition
12/09/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/09/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Charles J. Lieck, Sr.Amicus Curiae
Ed MeyerPetitioner
Great American Indemnity CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information