judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE VS. DISTRICT COURT (SNOW, JOHN) (DEATH PENALTY)

Case Information: 37309
Short Caption:STATE VS. DISTRICT COURT (SNOW, JOHN) (DEATH PENALTY)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 39354 , 53884 , 78607
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C061676Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Certiorari/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/18/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/18/2001Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. Petition for Writ of Prohibition or, in the Alternative, Mandamus. 01-01192
01/18/2001AppendixFiled Appendix. Petitioner's Appendix, Volumes 1 and 2. 01-01194
02/06/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due from the real party in interest, on behalf of respondents: 15 days from the date of this order. We stay the proceedings below presently scheduled for February 12, 2001. 01-02439
02/21/2001Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. 01-03281
02/21/2001AppendixFiled Appendix. Respondent's Appendix to Answer to Petition. 01-03282
03/07/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Petition. We "ORDER the petition GRANTED AND DIRECT THE CLERK OF THIS COURT TO ISSUE A WRIT OF MANDAMUS." fn8[We hereby vacate the stay previously imposed in our order of February 6, 2001. SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 01-04114
03/07/2001WritIssued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to Brian S. Rutledge for service upon Judge Lee A. Gates. 01-04130
03/15/2001WritFiled Writ. Served on Judge Gates on March 13, 2001. 01-04130
04/03/2001RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 01-04342
04/03/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.