Case Information: 37289 | |||
Short Caption: | MARKO (RONALD) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR960445 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 02/28/2001 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/12/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/12/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 01-00795 | |
02/13/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 37287/37289/37304/37305/37306. | 01-02881 | |
02/28/2001 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 and 2 (certified copies of Sealed Documents contained in an envelope, placed at the front of the Record on Appeal, Vol. 1.) Mailed on: 02/2701. | 01-03771 | |
02/28/2001 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
12/05/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' SNP02-CY/DA/ML | 01-20420 | |
01/02/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-20580 | |
01/02/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/18/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 4, 2002. | 01-20580 |