judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SOTERO LEPE NEGRETE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-39)
Case Number:06-39Case Docketed On:02/28/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Crook CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:SOTERO LEPE NEGRETE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:SOTERO LEPE NEGRETE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSotero Lepe NegreteKenneth M. Koski
Donna D. Domonkos
Ryan R. Roden
Kate McKay
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling
Eric Alan Johnson
Geoffrey Gunnerson
Jennifer Reece

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 88
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/28/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/28/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/28/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/14/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/14/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/31/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/02/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/14/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/17/2006Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
08/15/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record.BriefAppellantFinal
08/15/2006Notice-Incoming - Consent of Client. Kate McKay to appear on behalf of appellant.Notice-IncomingConsent of ClientFinal
09/29/2006Brief - Failure to file - appellee. Spoke with Mike Pauling - he will file a motion to be allowed to file a late brief.BriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
10/02/2006Motion - Accept late filing - brief of appellee.MotionAccept late filingFinal
10/24/2006Order - Granting motion for leave to file late brief.OrderGrantFinal
11/07/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/08/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/02/2006Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record.BriefAppelleeFinal
12/07/2006Notice-Incoming - Consent of Client. Geoffrey L. Gunnerson and Jennifer Reece to appear on behalf of appellee.Notice-IncomingConsent of ClientFinal
12/26/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/26/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/05/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Exhibits; Volume IV, Pre-sentence Investigation Report.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/05/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
02/15/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Ryan R. Roden and Kate McKay, Student Intern, argument by Ms. McKay; D. Michael Pauling and Jennifer Reece, Student Intern, argument by Ms. Reece) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/15/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/23/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/08/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/08/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/12/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal