judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BEALE, BRANDON G. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-0614
Short Caption:BEALE, BRANDON G. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4093-80Filed Date:05/01/1981

Opening Event Date:05/01/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/21/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/02/1982
Argued/Submitted:08/24/1982
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
James M. Fallon NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BEALE, BRANDON G. UNITED STATES
05/01/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/21/1981FiledRecord Completed
04/02/1982FiledBriefing Completed
08/24/1982FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/20/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition