Case Information: 33185 | |||
Short Caption: | BLANCO (MICHELL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C62290 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/12/1999 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
10/16/1998 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
10/16/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | ||
11/10/1998 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 33070, 33103, 33117, 33120, 33153, 33185, 33199, 33200, 33264, 33265. | ||
03/12/1999 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 20. Mailed on: 1/9/99. (Received Vols. 1 through 17 on 1/12/99 and Vols. 18 - 20 on 1/11/99). Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | ||
03/12/1999 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
06/07/1999 | Motion | Received Proper Person Motion. For appointment of counsel on appeal. | ||
10/11/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." fn2[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP00A-WM/ML/NB | 00-17976 | |
11/07/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-18209 | |
11/07/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/04/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 13, 2000. | 00-18209 |