Case: A-4958
A-4958
11/12/1954
Application for Writ of Error
WILLIAM DELLERMAN, ET UX.
C. A. MANGOLD, ET UX.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/28/1955 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
01/20/1955 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
11/16/1954 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
11/12/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/28/1955 | Reply to Response | | ||
01/26/1955 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
01/20/1955 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
11/16/1954 | Response to Petition | | ||
11/12/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Refused | | |
11/12/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
William Dellerman, et ux. | Petitioner | |
C. A. Mangold, et ux. | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information