Case Information: 32874 | |||
Short Caption: | BASSETT VS. WARDEN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - HC9803005 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/03/1999 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/21/1998 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. | ||
08/21/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | ||
09/16/1998 | Order/Procedural | Filed Case Processing Order. Re: Records on Appeal. Within 120 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record in each of the above-identified appeals, as well as any previously prepared transripts of the district court proceedings. fn1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 32859, 32874. | ||
03/03/1999 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. Volume 1 (copy). Mailed on: 3/1/99. | ||
03/03/1999 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
03/29/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. "ORDER these appeals dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML Nos. 31899, 32874. | 00-05006 | |
04/25/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-06617 | |
04/25/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/05/2000 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from Supreme Court of the United States. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed May 4, 2000, and placed on the docket May 26, 2000, as no. 99-9698. Nos. 31899, 32874. | ||
06/07/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 1, 2000. | 00-06617 | |
10/11/2000 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Granted. The petition for a writ of ceritorari is denied. (No action required.) | 00-17977 |