Case: A-4946
A-4946
11/04/1954
Application for Writ of Error
PECOS COUNTY WATER CONTROL AND IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NO. 1
CLAYTON W. WILLIAMS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/10/1955 | Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
02/09/1955 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
12/09/1954 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
11/29/1954 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
11/12/1954 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | Petitioner | | |
11/04/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/19/1955 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
02/10/1955 | Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed | | ||
02/09/1955 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
12/09/1954 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
11/29/1954 | Response to Petition | | ||
11/12/1954 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | | ||
11/06/1954 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response | | ||
11/04/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
11/04/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Clayton W. Williams, et al. | Respondent | |
Pecos County Water Control and Improvement District No. 1 | Petitioner | |
High Plains Underground Water Conservation District No. 1 | Amicus Curiae |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information