judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DAVID LARRY ABEYTA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-123)
Case Number:06-123Case Docketed On:06/06/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:DAVID LARRY ABEYTA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DAVID LARRY ABEYTA, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDavid Larry AbeytaD. Terry Rogers
Donna D. Domonkos
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
David L. Delicath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 142
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/06/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/06/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/06/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/21/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/24/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/06/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/06/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/22/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy of designation of record on appeal and copy of brief on diskBriefAppellantFinal
10/23/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/24/2006Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
12/07/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/11/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/23/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/24/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/23/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of designation of record on appeal and copy of brief on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
03/01/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
03/13/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/14/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
03/21/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Confidential Folder; Volume III, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/21/2007Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/05/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/21/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/21/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/21/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/25/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal