judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

OESBY, CURTIS L. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-0620
Short Caption:OESBY, CURTIS L. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Lead: 81-CF-0606 Consolidated:81-CF-0620, 82-CF-0824
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6447-79Filed Date:04/22/1981

Opening Event Date:04/22/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/21/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/23/1983
Argued/Submitted:05/25/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901OESBY, CURTIS L. AKA LAWRENCE E. STATON UNITED STATES
04/22/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/21/1981FiledRecord Completed
03/23/1983FiledBriefing Completed
05/25/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/02/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition