judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

F. F. DOLLERT v. PRATT-HEWIT OIL CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case: A-172
A-172
05/11/1944
Application for Writ of Error
F. F. DOLLERT
PRATT-HEWIT OIL CORPORATION, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/12/1944Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
06/13/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/22/1944Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedPetitioner
05/15/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/11/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/17/1945Motion for production of documents filed
12/05/1944Certification (various) in case received
09/27/1944Order from Lower Court filed
09/12/1944Brief in Support of Petition
06/13/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/22/1944Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
05/15/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/11/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
05/11/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
F. F. DollertPetitioner
W. H. BladesAmicus Curiae
Pratt-Hewit Oil Corporation, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information