Case Information: 32967 | |||
Short Caption: | TAYLOR (BENJAMIN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C096391 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 01/11/1999 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/08/1998 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
09/08/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | ||
09/16/1998 | Order/Procedural | Filed Case Processing Order. Re: Records on Appeal. Within 120 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record in each of the above-identified appeals, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. fn1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 32914, 32917, 32927, 32931, 32967, 32984, 32986. | ||
01/11/1999 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. Vols. 1 and 2 (copies). Mailed on: 1/8/99. | ||
01/11/1999 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
08/16/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB | 00-14294 | |
09/12/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-14473 | |
09/12/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/06/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2000. | 00-14473 |