judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HOWARD (REGINALD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 32854
Short Caption:HOWARD (REGINALD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37692 , 38108 , 38604 , 41115 , 43031 , 49851 , 67750
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C147014Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/07/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/19/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/19/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.)
09/08/1998Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Joan D. Buckley representing appellant: (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
10/09/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. To Court Reporter: James Helleso.
10/09/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
12/09/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. 12/11/97, 4/9/98 and 6/9/98 Proceedings: Court Reporter: James A. Helleso.
12/17/1998MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: January 19, 1999.
01/19/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time.
02/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall on or before March 4, 1999, file the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Court Reporter James Helleso shall, within 20 days of the date of this order, file all the requested transcritps, inform this court why they cannot be filed, or show cause why he should not be sanctioned for failure to comply with NRAP 9.
02/25/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. 02/10/98 Proceedings: Court Reporter: James A. Helleso.
03/10/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion by Reginald Clarence Howard to extend time to file Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix.
03/12/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The motion filed March 10, 1999, is granted. The appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed on or before April 5, 1999.
04/05/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion by Reginald Clarence Howard to Extend Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix.
04/28/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall, by May 5, 1999, file and serve the opening brief and appendix or, if her client no longer wishes to proceed, file a motion to voluntarily dismiss this appeal. We do not expect further requests for extensions of time absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Extensions of time based on other factors may result in the imposition of sanctions.
05/12/1999BriefReceived Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 5/11/99.
05/12/1999AppendixReceived Appendix.
06/02/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We direct the clerk to, forthwith, file the opening brief and appendix submitted on May 12, 1999. Respondent shall, within 30 days of the date of this order, file and serve the answering brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). We caution attorney Buckley that we expect full compliance with all of our orders and procedural rules. In the future, anything less may result in the imposition of sanctions.
06/02/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief.
06/02/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief.
06/28/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express Mail-No Postmark.
07/28/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: August 27, 1999.
08/27/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time.
08/31/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The Reply Brief shall be served and filed on or before September 16, 1999.
10/28/1999BriefReceived Proper Person Brief. Appellant's Supplemental Brief (RETURNED, UNFILED SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF PER 12/30/99).
11/18/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion by Reginald Clarence Howard to file an untimely reply brief.
11/18/1999BriefReceived Reply Brief. Mailed on: 11/15/99.
11/19/1999Notice/IncomingReceived Proper Person Notice. Notice to the Court (RETURNED, UNFILED 2/24/00).
11/24/1999Notice/IncomingReceived Proper Person Notice. Notice to the Court Supplement.
12/02/1999Notice/IncomingReceived Proper Person Notice. Appellant Third Supplemental Notice to the Court (RETURNED, UNFILED 2/24/00).
12/30/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant's Supplemental Brief received by this court on October 28,1999, shall not be filed in this appeal. Further, the clerk of this court shall forthwith return the supplemental brief to appellant.
12/30/1999Other Returned Unfiled Document. Appellant's Supplemental Brief.
02/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Submitted date: February 7, 2000.
02/07/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/24/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. Appellant's Supplemental Brief (per 12/30/99 order).
02/24/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On November 18, 1999, Appellant's counsel filed a motion seeking an extension to file the reply brief. We grant the motion. The clerk, shall forthwith, file the reply brief provisionally received on November 18, 1999. Appellant has submitted several proper person documents entitled "notice to the court." Appellant is represented by counsel and has not been granted leave to file documents in proper person. The clerk shall return, unfiled, the proper person submissions of November 19, 1999, November 24, 1999, and December 2, 1999.
02/24/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief.
02/24/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. Original proper person submissions of November 19, 1999, November 24, 1999, and December 2, 1999.
08/11/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-13999
09/06/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-14119
09/06/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2000. 00-14119