Case Information: 35655 | |||
Short Caption: | PHELPS (CHARLES) VS. WARDEN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 46385 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - C80P1592 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 01/18/2001 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/16/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/16/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). | 00-02484 | |
02/16/2000 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on December 23, 1999, appointing Karla K. Butko as counsel for appellant. | 00-02485 | |
02/17/2000 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: November 5, 1999. Court Reporter: Lesley A. Clarkson. | 00-02560 | |
02/23/2000 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. 12/17/99 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Cindy Lee Brown. | 00-02864 | |
02/28/2000 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Order Re: Court Appointed Counsel for Appeal. Certified copy of order filed in district court on February 17, 2000. Karla K. Butko is appointed as attorney of record for the appeal. | 00-03142 | |
03/01/2000 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. District court minutes. Due Date: 10 days | ||
03/02/2000 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 00-03302 | |
03/02/2000 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Previously Requested and Received Transcripts. | 00-03304 | |
05/09/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The Washoe County Clerk shall within 10 days of the date of this order transmit the district court minutes in Case Number C80P1592. | 00-07654 | |
06/14/2000 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 6/14/00 (Reno/Carson). | 00-10137 | |
06/14/2000 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 00-10139 | |
06/28/2000 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: 6/23/00. | 00-11070 | |
01/18/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We decline to grant appellant permission to proceed in proper person. We direct the clerk of this court to return to appellant, unfiled, the proper person documents received on July 7, 2000, July 19, 2000, and August 23, 2000. Appellant shall proceed by and through counsel in this appeal, and shall address all concerns relating to this appeal to his his counsel of record. | 01-01079 | |
01/18/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. to appellant Charles A. Phelps: returned unfiled, the original proper person Judicial Notice of, Adjudicated Facts, Pur. NRS.47.130; 47.140; 47.150; 47.160. Requested Permission to Submit N.R.A.P., 46, & 31, received July 7, 2000; Requesting Permission to, Submit, Pur. To, NRAP. 46(b) & 31, received July 19, 2000; Appellant's Opening Brief 7 Appellant's Supplemental Brief, received August 23, 2000. | ||
01/18/2001 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
02/09/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB | 01-02677 | |
03/07/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-02902 | |
03/07/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/13/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 9, 2001. | 01-02902 | |
09/08/2003 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. Original and two copies of the document entitled, "Motion for Production of the Transcripts, Pleadings, Orders, the Court Documents, etc. at State Expense." | ||
12/07/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On July 20, 2005, appellant submitted a document entitled 'Extraordinary Writ of Error Coram Nobis: (Habeas Corpus)' and received in the above-entitled appeal. Further review of this document reveals that it should have been docketed as a separate and distinct case. We direct the clerk to docket appellant's document received on July 20, 2005, as a separate case. | 05-23906 |