Case Information: 32858 | |||
Short Caption: | SEARLE VS. SAID | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A348790 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 08/24/1998 / Gladstone, Arthur | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 10/04/1999 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/19/1998 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 (Nevada General Ins. Co. - Check no. 20979) | ||
08/19/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | ||
08/24/1998 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. Issued Notice of Settlement Conference. Settlement Judge: Arthur A. Gladstone. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
08/27/1998 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. | ||
09/03/1998 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | ||
10/15/1998 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Certified copy of Reporter's Transcript dated: August 11, 1998. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. | ||
10/28/1998 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Settlement Conference Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | ||
11/09/1998 | Order/Procedural | Filed Case Processing Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant shall have 70 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | ||
01/21/1999 | Brief | Filed Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: 1/15/99). | ||
01/21/1999 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Joint Appendix, vols. 1 and 2. | ||
01/22/1999 | Other | Other. Filed Certificate of Mailing. | ||
02/11/1999 | Brief | Filed Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief (Mailed on: 2/10/99). | ||
03/16/1999 | Brief | Filed Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on 3/12/99). | ||
10/04/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Case Processing Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. | ||
10/04/1999 | Other | Other. Case Submitted on the record and briefs this day. | ||
10/04/1999 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
11/15/1999 | Other | Other. Filed Notice of Change of Address for Randall H. Pike. | ||
08/18/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Remand. " . . . the order of the district court is reversed and this matter is remanded for further proceedings consistent with this order." fn6[In light of our disposition, we decline to address Searle's contention that the order striking his request for trial de novo violated his right to a jury trial.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB | 00-14542 | |
09/13/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-14714 | |
09/13/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/25/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 4, 2000. | 00-14714 |