Case Information: 37314 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF FRANK D. WINSTON | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | NONE | Classification: | Bar Matter - Other - Petition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/19/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/19/2001 | Petition/Bar | Filed Petition. Petition for SCR 114 Reciprocal Discipline. | 01-01289 | |
02/02/2001 | Petition/Bar | Filed Petition. Response to Petition for SCR 114 Reciprocal Discipline. | 01-02265 | |
02/08/2001 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Non-Opposition. | 01-02638 | |
02/23/2001 | Order/Dispositional Bar | Filed Bar Discipline Order. Order Granting Petition for Reciprocal Discipline and Suspending Attorney Winston. " . . . Winston is suspended for two years from November 15, 2000, with the suspension to be stayed; Winston is placed on probation for two years subject to the conditions stated in the California order, including an actual suspension of ninety days from November 15, 2000." Winston shall not be required to comply with the reinstatement provisions of SCR 116, but shall provide copies of his reports to the California disciplinary authorities to Nevada bar counsel. Additionally, Winston shall provide Nevada bar counsel with proof that he passed the MPRE and has otherwise met the conditions of his California probation. Winston and state bar shall comply with the provisions of SCR 115. EN BANC-WM/CY/MS/DA/RR/ML/NB | 01-03427 | |
03/21/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/21/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 01-03768 | |
03/21/2001 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Certificate of Service by Mail and Notice of Order to Public. | 01-05027 |