Case Information: 37283 | |||
Short Caption: | ROWELL (LAMARR) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 35959 , 36997 , 37267 , 37836 , 37837 , 37838 , 37839 , 37911 , 43019 , 43373 , 43728 , 44595 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C149775 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/05/2001 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/12/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/12/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 01-00723 | |
02/13/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. original record due: 30 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] | 01-02872 | |
03/05/2001 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 and 2. Mailed on: 02/28/01. | 01-03950 | |
03/05/2001 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
04/17/2001 | Order/Procedural | Order. If the July 24, 1998 transcript of argument and decision on appellant's pretrial habeas corpus petition or the July 22, 1999 entry of plea transcript have already been prepared, the clerk of the district court shall have 10 days from the date of this order to transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the transcripts as a supplemental record on appeal. If the transcripts have not already been prepared, the district court shall order the prompt preparation of the transcripts. Upon the completion and filing of the transcripts in the district court, the clerk of the district court shall have 10 days to transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the transcripts as a supplemental record on appeal. | 01-06548 | |
05/14/2001 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: July 22, 1999. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. | 01-08009 | |
05/31/2001 | Order/Procedural | Order. If the July 24, 1998 transcript has already been prepared, the clerk of the district court shall have 10 days from the date of this order to transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the transcript as a supplemental record on appeal. If the transcript has not already been prepared, the district court shall order the prompt preparation of the transcript. Upon the completion and filing of the transcript in the district court, the clerk of the district court shall have 10 days to transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the transcript as a supplemental record on appeal. | 01-09078 | |
06/04/2001 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: July 22, 1999. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. | 01-09246 | |
06/08/2001 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: July 24, 1998. Court Reporter: Joseph D'Amato. | 01-09587 | |
06/18/2001 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Volume 3. | 01-10116 | |
07/09/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court affirmed.' fn17[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.]SNP01A-CY/ML/NB | 01-11537 | |
07/26/2001 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Denied. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed July 19, 2001 and placed on the docket as Case no. 01-5407. | 01-12733 | |
08/08/2001 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." SNP01A-CY/ML/NB | 01-13415 | |
08/24/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-13442 | |
08/24/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
09/17/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 10, 2001. | 01-13442 | |
10/08/2001 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Granted. The petition for a writ of ceritorari is denied. Nos. 36601/36658/37023/37283/37766/37767/37768. (01-16839) (No action required.) |