Case Information: 37305 | |||
Short Caption: | BUCKMASTER (BRETT) VS. STATE C/W 37306 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 37305*, 37306 | Related Case(s): | 36381 |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR992257 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/01/2001 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/18/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/18/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 01-01138 | |
02/13/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 37287/37289/37304/37305/37306. | 01-02884 | |
03/01/2001 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on: 02/28/01. | 01-03811 | |
03/01/2001 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
11/21/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for an evidentiary hearing on appellant's ineffective assistance of counsel claim." NNP02-MS/RR/NB. Nos. 37305/37306. | 01-19602 | |
12/18/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-19953 | |
12/18/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/18/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 2, 2002. | 01-19953 |